Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB914 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2022
Bill December 8, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis April 29, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill March 31, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023