Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB92 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 23, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 17, 2023
Fiscal Note February 28, 2023