House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1344 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 295 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 295 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |