Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1820 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3884 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1501 | Journal Page: 3884 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3884 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3883 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3807 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1460 | Journal Page: 3806 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3806 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Amended | 1-Dutton | Journal Page: 3805 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3805 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1395 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 407 | |
House | 12/08/2022 | Filed |