H.C.R. No. 101 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION WHEREAS, The tragic passing of Brendan Luis Torres of the Dalhart Volunteer Fire Department on October 4, 2022, at the age of 19, brought an incalculable loss to all those who were fortunate enough to know this remarkable young man; and WHEREAS, Brendan Torres was born in Dalhart on June 10, 2003, to Jesse and Shannon Torres, and he grew up with the companionship of his brother, Devin, and sister, Alex; he had recently graduated from Dalhart High School in May 2022, and while in school, he played youth baseball and football, participated in the Dalhart FFA and 4-H club, and studied agricultural mechanics; he began taking college welding classes during his junior and senior year, and he was working toward completing his welding degree and earning his commercial driver's license; and WHEREAS, Since the age of three, Mr. Torres had set his sights on becoming a firefighter; he officially joined the Dalhart Volunteer Fire Department on July 15, 2022, following in the footsteps of his older brother, and he was eager to learn every aspect of the job; he was a hard worker throughout his life, and he distinguished himself with his dedication to going above and beyond to serve his community as a member of the DVFD; in addition to being a volunteer firefighter, he lent his time to the XIT Rodeo & Reunion alongside his brother for many years; and WHEREAS, Mr. Torres's cherished family included his nephew, Edward, and niece, Hadley; he also enjoyed spending time with his horse, Apollo, and taking him to help out at junior rodeos; outgoing and gregarious, Mr. Torres readily endeared himself to new acquaintances, and he had an easy way of uplifting anyone who was feeling down; and WHEREAS, Although Brendan Torres is greatly missed by those he left behind, they will forever remember his warm heart, his enthusiasm for life, and his deep devotion to those he loved; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas hereby pay tribute to the memory of Brendan Luis Torres and extend profound condolences to the members of his family: to his parents, Jesse and Shannon Torres; to his siblings, Devin and Alex; to his nephew, Edward Bryce, and niece, Hadley Rose; to his grandparents, Juan and Mary Torres, Gloria Rael, and Bob Holland; to his aunts, uncles, and cousins; and to his many other relatives, friends, and colleagues; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of Brendan Torres. Smithee ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 101 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on April 5, 2023. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 101 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the Senate on April 6, 2023. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor