Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR101 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.C.R. No. 101
1+88R21445 JH-D
2+ By: Smithee H.C.R. No. 101
23
34
4- HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
5+ CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
56 WHEREAS, The tragic passing of Brendan Luis Torres of the
67 Dalhart Volunteer Fire Department on October 4, 2022, at the age of
78 19, brought an incalculable loss to all those who were fortunate
89 enough to know this remarkable young man; and
910 WHEREAS, Brendan Torres was born in Dalhart on June 10, 2003,
1011 to Jesse and Shannon Torres, and he grew up with the companionship
1112 of his brother, Devin, and sister, Alex; he had recently graduated
1213 from Dalhart High School in May 2022, and while in school, he played
1314 youth baseball and football, participated in the Dalhart FFA and
1415 4-H club, and studied agricultural mechanics; he began taking
1516 college welding classes during his junior and senior year, and he
1617 was working toward completing his welding degree and earning his
1718 commercial driver's license; and
1819 WHEREAS, Since the age of three, Mr. Torres had set his
1920 sights on becoming a firefighter; he officially joined the Dalhart
2021 Volunteer Fire Department on July 15, 2022, following in the
2122 footsteps of his older brother, and he was eager to learn every
2223 aspect of the job; he was a hard worker throughout his life, and he
2324 distinguished himself with his dedication to going above and beyond
2425 to serve his community as a member of the DVFD; in addition to being
2526 a volunteer firefighter, he lent his time to the XIT Rodeo & Reunion
2627 alongside his brother for many years; and
2728 WHEREAS, Mr. Torres's cherished family included his nephew,
2829 Edward, and niece, Hadley; he also enjoyed spending time with his
2930 horse, Apollo, and taking him to help out at junior rodeos; outgoing
3031 and gregarious, Mr. Torres readily endeared himself to new
3132 acquaintances, and he had an easy way of uplifting anyone who was
3233 feeling down; and
3334 WHEREAS, Although Brendan Torres is greatly missed by those
3435 he left behind, they will forever remember his warm heart, his
3536 enthusiasm for life, and his deep devotion to those he loved; now,
3637 therefore, be it
3738 RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas
3839 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Brendan Luis Torres and extend
3940 profound condolences to the members of his family: to his parents,
4041 Jesse and Shannon Torres; to his siblings, Devin and Alex; to his
4142 nephew, Edward Bryce, and niece, Hadley Rose; to his grandparents,
4243 Juan and Mary Torres, Gloria Rael, and Bob Holland; to his aunts,
4344 uncles, and cousins; and to his many other relatives, friends, and
4445 colleagues; and, be it further
4546 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
4647 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
4748 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
4849 Brendan Torres.
49- Smithee
50- ______________________________ ______________________________
51- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
52- I certify that H.C.R. No. 101 was unanimously adopted by a
53- rising vote of the House on April 5, 2023.
54- ______________________________
55- Chief Clerk of the House
56- I certify that H.C.R. No. 101 was unanimously adopted by a
57- rising vote of the Senate on April 6, 2023.
58- ______________________________
59- Secretary of the Senate
60- APPROVED: __________________
61- Date
62- __________________
63- Governor