E | 05/15/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4387 | |
E | 05/04/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3212 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1535 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2912 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2575 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1447 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1202 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1796 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1796 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Filed |