House | 05/06/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3314 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SCR 44 | Journal Page: 3314 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Postponed | 5/6/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2902 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2901 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2578 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Filed |