E | 06/13/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6491 | |
E | 05/30/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6489 | |
Senate | 05/29/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3303 | |
House | 05/28/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6422 | |
House | 05/27/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6428 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5891 | |
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2993 | |
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2993 | |
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 2993 | |
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2993 | |
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2993 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2145 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Record vote | RV#1841 | Journal Page: 4623 |
House | 05/19/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4623 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4623 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 4044 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Filed |