Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR114 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2023

                            H.C.R. No. 114


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, A life made rich through meaningful service drew to
 a close with the passing of Arch Hartwell Aplin Jr. on
 April 26, 2023, at the age of 97; and
 WHEREAS, Arch Aplin was born in Harrisonburg, Louisiana, on
 July 31, 1925, to Arch and Mae Aplin, and he grew up with five
 siblings, Marvin, Morris, Jimmy, William, and Onita; answering his
 nation's call to duty, he joined the U.S. Navy at the age of 16, and
 he served aboard the USS Wichita during World War II, seeing combat
 in both the European and Pacific Theaters; and
 WHEREAS, Following the war, Mr. Aplin earned a master's
 degree from Stephen F. Austin State University and moved to
 Brazoria County, where he embarked on a long and rewarding career as
 a teacher and basketball coach at Clute Intermediate School; he
 later transitioned into residential construction and real estate
 development, and he built many homes in the Lake Jackson community,
 including in the Sleepy Hollow and Oyster Bend subdivisions; he was
 still planning construction projects in his final days; he was a
 longtime member of the First National Bank of Lake Jackson board of
 directors; and
 WHEREAS, In all his endeavors, Mr. Aplin benefited from the
 love and support of his partner, Mildred Hunt; he was the proud
 father of five children, Beaver, Reginald, Wayne, Michele, and
 Ollamae, and he experienced the joy of welcoming eight
 grandchildren and two great-grandchildren into his family; in
 addition to spending time with his loved ones, he enjoyed fishing,
 traveling, and watching the sun set at Surfside Beach; and
 WHEREAS, Although Arch Aplin is deeply missed, memories of
 his kindness, his generosity, and his passion for life remain to
 comfort and inspire those he leaves behind; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Arch Hartwell Aplin Jr. and extend
 heartfelt sympathy to the members of his family: to his partner,
 Mildred Hunt; to his sons, Arch "Beaver" Aplin III and his wife,
 Joanie, and Reginald Joseph Aplin and his wife, Phyllis; to his
 grandchildren, Ron Hidalgo, Nicole LeBoeuf, Joshua Dickerson,
 Anne-Elizabeth Brown, Katherine Aplin, Arch Hartwell "Hart"
 Aplin IV, Beau Aaron Aplin, and Cole Ryan Aplin; to his
 great-grandchildren, Kaiden Funderburg and Trystyn Ingram; and to
 his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Arch Aplin.
 Vasut
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 114 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 114 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 27, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor