E | 05/30/2023 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 6490 | |
Senate | 05/29/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3303 | |
House | 05/28/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6422 | |
House | 05/28/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6488 | |
House | 05/27/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5973 | |
Senate | 05/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3108 | |
Senate | 05/27/2023 | Adopted | HB 1605 | Journal Page: 3108 |
Senate | 05/27/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3107 | |
Senate | 05/27/2023 | Postponed | Journal Page: 3107 | |
Senate | 05/27/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 3107 | |
Senate | 05/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3107 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2573 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Record vote | RV#2079 | Journal Page: 5286 |
House | 05/24/2023 | Adopted | HB 1605 | Journal Page: 5286 |
House | 05/24/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5286 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Filed |