E | 06/13/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6491 | |
E | 05/30/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6489 | |
Senate | 05/29/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3303 | |
House | 05/28/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6422 | |
House | 05/28/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6488 | |
House | 05/27/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5973 | |
Senate | 05/27/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 3175 | |
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 3001 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5623 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 5623 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Filed |