E | 01/25/2023 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 224 | |
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 90 | |
House | 01/25/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 221 | |
House | 01/24/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 221 | |
House | 01/24/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 47 | |
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 47 | |
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 47 | |
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 47 | |
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 46 | |
House | 01/17/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 193 | |
House | 01/17/2023 | Record vote | RV#20 | Journal Page: 192 |
House | 01/17/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 192 | |
House | 01/17/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 192 | |
House | 01/13/2023 | Filed |