Senate | 05/12/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1705 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1304 | Journal Page: 3496 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3496 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3495 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select | Journal Page: 431 | |
House | 02/13/2023 | Filed |