Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR47 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/13/2023

                            88R1252 CJC-D
 By: Canales H.C.R. No. 47


 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Section 7-c(f), Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 provides: "The legislature by adoption of a resolution approved by
 a record vote of a majority of the members of each house of the
 legislature may extend, in 10-year increments, the duty of the
 comptroller of public accounts to make a deposit under Subsection
 (a) or (b) of this section beyond the applicable date prescribed by
 Subsection (e) of this section."; and
 WHEREAS, Under Section 7-c(e)(1), Article VIII, Texas
 Constitution, the duty of the comptroller of public accounts under
 Section 7-c(a) of that article to deposit to the credit of the state
 highway fund $2.5 billion of the net revenue derived from the
 imposition of the state sales and use tax on the sale, storage, use,
 or other consumption in this state of taxable items under Chapter
 151, Tax Code, or its successor, that exceeds the first $28 billion
 of that revenue coming into the treasury in that state fiscal year
 expires August 31, 2032; and
 WHEREAS, Under Section 7-c(e)(2), Article VIII, Texas
 Constitution, the duty of the comptroller of public accounts under
 Section 7-c(b) of that article to deposit to the credit of the state
 highway fund an amount equal to 35 percent of the net revenue
 derived from the tax authorized by Chapter 152, Tax Code, or its
 successor, and imposed on the sale, use, or rental of a motor
 vehicle that exceeds the first $5 billion of that revenue coming
 into the treasury in that state fiscal year expires August 31, 2029;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas, That
 the duty of the comptroller of public accounts under Section
 7-c(a), Article VIII, Texas Constitution, to deposit to the credit
 of the state highway fund $2.5 billion of the net revenue derived
 from the imposition of the state sales and use tax on the sale,
 storage, use, or other consumption in this state of taxable items
 under Chapter 151, Tax Code, or its successor, that exceeds the
 first $28 billion of that revenue coming into the treasury in that
 state fiscal year is extended and expires August 31, 2042; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That the duty of the comptroller of public accounts
 under Section 7-c(b), Article VIII, Texas Constitution, to deposit
 to the credit of the state highway fund an amount equal to 35
 percent of the net revenue derived from the tax authorized by
 Chapter 152, Tax Code, or its successor, and imposed on the sale,
 use, or rental of a motor vehicle that exceeds the first $5 billion
 of that revenue coming into the treasury in that state fiscal year
 is extended and expires August 31, 2039; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That this resolution is adopted only if approved by
 a record vote of a majority of the members of each house of the
 legislature; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the secretary of state forward an official
 copy of this resolution to the comptroller of public accounts.