Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR5 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/27/2023 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23