Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR68 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/15/2023

                            H.C.R. No. 68


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, May 28, 2023, marks the 100th anniversary of the
 discovery of oil in Reagan County at the Santa Rita No. 1 oil well,
 an event that sparked a wave of exploration and development that
 would transform the Permian Basin into one of the most productive
 oil fields in the world; and
 WHEREAS, Santa Rita No. 1 is located on land in Reagan County
 that the State of Texas set aside for the support of public higher
 education in Texas, initially for The University of Texas System
 and later for The Texas A&M University System; the land was later
 leased to El Pasoans Frank T. Pickrell and Haymon Krupp, who
 solicited funding from investors to build a drilling operation; the
 first oil test on the Group No. 1 acreage was named after Santa
 Rita, the patron saint of impossible causes, and drilling commenced
 at the site on January 8, 1921; and
 WHEREAS, For 646 days, the cable-tool rig broke through the
 ground at a pace of under five feet per day, while a two-man crew
 bailed the hole; late on May 27, 1923, driller Carl Cromwell ordered
 the shutdown of the well when he saw gas bubbles escaping from the
 casinghead, a sign that they had struck oil; his suspicions were
 confirmed early the following day, when a fountain of oil erupted
 over the rig's derrick, covering a 250-yard area around the site;
 the news of the find soon spread to local residents and scouts from
 major oil companies, and continued exploration would reveal further
 oil reserves on the land; other spectacular oil discoveries
 throughout the region would follow, which would make the Permian
 Basin the epicenter of petroleum production in the United States
 for decades to come; and
 WHEREAS, In 1940, the Texas State Historical Association
 oversaw the relocation of the original Santa Rita rig to The
 University of Texas at Austin campus for preservation purposes; oil
 continued to be pumped from the Santa Rita well for nearly 67 years,
 before the well finally reached the end of its production life and
 was plugged in 1990; and
 WHEREAS, The discovery of oil at Santa Rita No. 1 had a
 profound and transformative impact on the State of Texas and on the
 higher education entities, The University of Texas System and later
 The Texas A&M University System, that shared in the benefit of the
 find, and the far-reaching effects of this watershed moment in
 Texas history continue to be seen to this day; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby commemorate the 100th anniversary of the discovery of oil at
 Santa Rita No. 1 and pay tribute to the well's historical
 significance and enduring legacy.
 Darby
 Landgraf
 King of Hemphill
 Morales of Maverick
 Murr
 Craddick
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 68 was adopted by the House on March
 8, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 68 was adopted by the Senate on
 March 13, 2023, by a viva-voce vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor