E | 04/06/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1304 | |
E | 03/27/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 634 | |
House | 03/27/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 912 | |
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 913 | |
House | 03/23/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 905 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 371 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 529 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#45 | Journal Page: 529 |
House | 03/08/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 433 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Filed |