E | 06/09/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6490 | |
E | 05/24/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5620 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2480 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4980 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4998 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4562 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1998 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1998 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1998 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1998 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1988 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1745 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1745 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1171 | Journal Page: 3243 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3243 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3243 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 626 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |