Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR83 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2023
Bill

House Committee Report

Bill

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023
Analysis
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Bill

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2023