Senate | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1960 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1960 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1202 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | RV#387 | Journal Page: 1784 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1286 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development | Journal Page: 770 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Filed |