1 | | - | H.J.R. No. 125 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Ashby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.J.R. No. 125 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2023; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 3, 2023, rereferred to Committee on Finance; |
---|
| 5 | + | May 16, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
| 6 | + | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 16, Nays 1; May 16, 2023, |
---|
| 7 | + | sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.J.R. No. 125 By: Huffman |
---|
5 | 13 | | proposing a constitutional amendment creating the broadband |
---|
6 | 14 | | infrastructure fund to expand high-speed broadband access and |
---|
7 | 15 | | assist in the financing of connectivity projects. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by |
---|
10 | 18 | | adding Section 49-d-16 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 49-d-16. (a) In this section: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (1) "Comptroller" means the comptroller of public |
---|
13 | 21 | | accounts of the State of Texas or its successor. |
---|
14 | 22 | | (2) "Fund" means the broadband infrastructure fund. |
---|
15 | 23 | | (b) The broadband infrastructure fund is created as a |
---|
16 | 24 | | special fund in the state treasury outside the general revenue |
---|
17 | 25 | | fund. |
---|
18 | 26 | | (c) The fund consists of: |
---|
19 | 27 | | (1) money transferred or deposited to the credit of |
---|
20 | 28 | | the fund by this constitution, general law, or the General |
---|
21 | 29 | | Appropriations Act; |
---|
22 | 30 | | (2) revenue that the legislature by general law |
---|
23 | 31 | | dedicates for deposit to the credit of the fund; |
---|
24 | 32 | | (3) investment earnings and interest earned on money |
---|
25 | 33 | | in the fund; and |
---|
26 | 34 | | (4) gifts, grants, and donations to the fund. |
---|
27 | 35 | | (d) Money in the fund shall be administered by the |
---|
31 | 39 | | (1) the development, construction, reconstruction, |
---|
32 | 40 | | and expansion of broadband and telecommunications infrastructure |
---|
33 | 41 | | or services; |
---|
34 | 42 | | (2) the operation of broadband and telecommunications |
---|
35 | 43 | | infrastructure; |
---|
36 | 44 | | (3) the provision of broadband and telecommunications |
---|
37 | 45 | | services; and |
---|
38 | 46 | | (4) the reasonable expenses of administering and |
---|
39 | 47 | | managing the investments of the fund. |
---|
40 | 48 | | (e) The legislature by general law shall provide for the |
---|
41 | 49 | | manner in which the assets of the fund may be used, subject to the |
---|
42 | 50 | | limitations of this section. Money in the fund may be used in |
---|
43 | 51 | | conjunction with other funds or financial resources, including |
---|
44 | 52 | | money from the federal government, in accordance with procedures, |
---|
45 | 53 | | standards, and limitations established by federal law and general |
---|
46 | 54 | | law of this state. |
---|
47 | | - | (f) The comptroller may transfer money from the fund to |
---|
48 | | - | another fund as provided by general law. The state agency that |
---|
49 | | - | administers the fund to which the money is transferred as |
---|
50 | | - | authorized by this subsection may use the money without further |
---|
51 | | - | appropriation only for the expansion of access to and adoption of |
---|
52 | | - | broadband and telecommunications services as provided by general |
---|
53 | | - | law. |
---|
| 55 | + | (f) For purposes of Section 22, Article VIII, of this |
---|
| 56 | + | constitution: |
---|
| 57 | + | (1) money in the fund is dedicated by this |
---|
| 58 | + | constitution; and |
---|
| 59 | + | (2) an appropriation of state tax revenues for the |
---|
| 60 | + | purpose of depositing money to the credit of the fund is treated as |
---|
| 61 | + | if it were an appropriation of revenues dedicated by this |
---|
| 62 | + | constitution. |
---|
54 | 63 | | (g) Unless extended by adoption of a concurrent resolution |
---|
55 | 64 | | approved by a record vote of two-thirds of the members of each house |
---|
56 | 65 | | of the legislature, this section expires on September 1, 2035. A |
---|
57 | 66 | | resolution suspends the expiration of this section until September |
---|
58 | 67 | | 1 of the 10th year following the adoption of the resolution. |
---|
59 | 68 | | (h) Immediately before the expiration of this section, the |
---|
60 | 69 | | comptroller shall transfer any unexpended and unobligated balance |
---|
61 | 70 | | remaining in the fund to the general revenue fund. |
---|
70 | 71 | | SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to |
---|
71 | 72 | | the Texas Constitution: |
---|
72 | 73 | | TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies |
---|
73 | 74 | | to the amendment to Article III of this constitution as proposed by |
---|
74 | 75 | | the 88th Legislature, Regular Session, 2023, creating the broadband |
---|
75 | 76 | | infrastructure fund to expand high-speed broadband access and |
---|
76 | 77 | | assist in the financing of connectivity projects. |
---|
77 | 78 | | (b) The change made to Article III of this constitution by |
---|
78 | 79 | | the amendment described in Subsection (a) of this section takes |
---|
79 | 80 | | effect January 1, 2024. |
---|
80 | 81 | | (c) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2025. |
---|
81 | 82 | | SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
82 | 83 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023. |
---|
83 | 84 | | The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the |
---|
84 | 85 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment creating the broadband |
---|
85 | 86 | | infrastructure fund to expand high-speed broadband access and |
---|
86 | 87 | | assist in the financing of connectivity projects." |
---|
87 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
88 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
89 | | - | I certify that H.J.R. No. 125 was passed by the House on April |
---|
90 | | - | 26, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 7, 1 present, not |
---|
91 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
92 | | - | H.J.R. No. 125 on May 23, 2023, by a non-record vote and requested |
---|
93 | | - | the appointment of a conference committee to consider the |
---|
94 | | - | differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the |
---|
95 | | - | conference committee report on H.J.R. No. 125 on May 28, 2023, by |
---|
96 | | - | the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 10, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
97 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
98 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
99 | | - | I certify that H.J.R. No. 125 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
100 | | - | amendments, on May 18, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
101 | | - | 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
102 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
103 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.J.R. |
---|
104 | | - | No. 125 on May 28, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
105 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
106 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
107 | | - | RECEIVED: __________________ |
---|
108 | | - | Date |
---|
109 | | - | __________________ |
---|
110 | | - | Secretary of State |
---|
| 88 | + | * * * * * |
---|