Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note
Bill

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill
Fiscal Note
Analysis

Senate Committee Report

Bill
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2023
Fiscal Note April 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023