E | 05/19/2023 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 4999 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2130 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4605 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4609 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4554 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1980 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1980 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1980 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1980 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1980 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1980 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1979 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1859 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1808 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1758 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3793 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1452 | Journal Page: 3793 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3793 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3793 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3468 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 626 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Filed |