Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR144 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 04/20/2023

                            By: Canales, Goldman, Cain, Lozano, Hunter, H.J.R. No. 144
 et al.


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the use of money
 in the state highway fund for roadways for seaports, airports,
 spaceports, land ports of entry, and international bridges.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-a.  Subject to legislative appropriation, allocation
 and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment of all
 refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived from
 motor vehicle registration fees, [and] all taxes, except gross
 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, and all other
 revenue dedicated by the Legislature specifically for a purpose
 described by this section that is not otherwise dedicated by this
 constitution shall be used for the sole purpose of acquiring
 rights-of-way, constructing, maintaining, and policing such public
 roadways, and for the administration of such laws as may be
 prescribed by the Legislature pertaining to the supervision of
 traffic and safety on such roads; and for the purpose of
 constructing and maintaining roadways for seaports, airports,
 spaceports, land ports of entry, and international bridges [payment
 of the principal and interest on county and road district bonds or
 warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, 1939, and declared
 eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment out of the County and
 Road District Highway Fund under existing law]; provided, however,
 that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from the motor fuel tax
 shall be allocated to the Available School Fund; and, provided,
 however, that the net revenue derived by counties from motor
 vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the maximum
 amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the percentage
 allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in effect on
 January 1, 1945.  Nothing contained herein shall be construed as
 authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any purpose.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the use of
 money in the state highway fund for roadways for seaports,
 airports, spaceports, land ports of entry, and international
 bridges."