Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1716 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3670 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1398 | Journal Page: 3669 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 3669 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Amended | 1-Wilson | Journal Page: 3669 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3669 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 691 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Filed |