House
|
05/12/2023
|
Postponed
|
1/12/27 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4192
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4192
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/12/23 12:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4021
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4021
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Postponed 5/12/23 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Postponed 5/11/23 10:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3875
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1443
|
Journal Page: 3779
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3779
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3779
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
7-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amendment adopted as amended 7-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amendment amended
|
8-Geren
|
Journal Page: 3777
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3777
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
7-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 3776
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended
|
6-Manuel
|
Journal Page: 3776
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered 7-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended 6-Manuel
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended 5-Bucy
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3775
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-A. Johnson
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Article III, Section 56
|
Journal Page: 3771
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3771
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|