Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1486 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1486 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1248 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1887 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Record vote | RV#428 | Journal Page: 1887 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1887 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1887 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1709 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1486 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select | Journal Page: 693 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |