Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR204 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 88R14396 JAM-D
22 By: Bucy H.J.R. No. 204
33
44
55 A JOINT RESOLUTION
66 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the use of money
77 in the state highway fund for transit-oriented projects.
88 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
1010 is amended to read as follows:
1111 Sec. 7-a. Subject to legislative appropriation, allocation
1212 and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment of all
1313 refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived from
1414 motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
1515 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
1616 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
1717 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way, constructing,
1818 maintaining, and policing such public roadways, and for the
1919 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
2020 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
2121 and for constructing and maintaining transit-oriented projects
2222 [the payment of the principal and interest on county and road
2323 district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, 1939,
2424 and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment out of
2525 the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing law];
2626 provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from
2727 the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School Fund;
2828 and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by counties
2929 from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the
3030 maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the
3131 percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in
3232 effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be
3333 construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any
3434 purpose.
3535 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
3636 the Texas Constitution:
3737 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
3838 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 88th Legislature,
3939 Regular Session, 2023, authorizing the use of money in the state
4040 highway fund for transit-oriented projects.
4141 (b) The amendments to Section 7-a, Article VIII, of this
4242 constitution apply only in connection with a state fiscal biennium
4343 that begins on or after September 1, 2025.
4444 (c) This temporary provision expires September 2, 2025.
4545 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
4646 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.
4747 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
4848 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the use of
4949 money in the state highway fund for transit-oriented projects."