Senate | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1578 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1578 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2511 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Record vote | RV#764 | Journal Page: 2510 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2510 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 21(a) | Journal Page: 2510 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2510 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 366 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |