House | 04/19/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1643 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Record vote | RV#302 | Journal Page: 1642 |
House | 04/19/2023 | Failed of adoption | Journal Page: 1642 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 1642 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1612 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#293 | Journal Page: 1611 |
House | 04/18/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1611 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1611 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 913 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 368 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 368 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |