House | 04/25/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1986 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SJR 32 | Journal Page: 1985 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 465 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 465 | |
House | 01/18/2023 | Filed |