House | 04/21/2023 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 1383 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Filed |