Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1215 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/06/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 1:23PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 1:23PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:15PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:15PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:15PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:15PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:15PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 1:24PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 1:32PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:40PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:39PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:39PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:25PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:09AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:09AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:16AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:16AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:17AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 1:24PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:09AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:17AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:17AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:17AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:19AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:31AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:36AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:36AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:36AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:38AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:01AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:01AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:06AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:30AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:43AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:34AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:36AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:38AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:55AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 1:24PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:55AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:01AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:06AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:09AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:13AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:23AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:13AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 7 2023 5:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:15AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:30AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:21AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:17AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:09AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:09AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:16AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:17AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:55AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 10:23AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:19AM