Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:30PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:29PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:29PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:40PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:29PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:40PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:40PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:25PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:06PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:27PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:24PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:13PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:10PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:08PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:07PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:07PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:19PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:12PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:11PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:51PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:46PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 11:07PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:34PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:34PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:33PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:33PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:33PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 10:33PM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:49AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:49AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:49AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:49AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:49AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:51AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 8:51AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:50AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:05AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:05AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:05AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:05AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:05AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:06AM
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2023 11:34AM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:53PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:53PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:25PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:53PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:56PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:53PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:56PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:26PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:27PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:27PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:27PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:27PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:30PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:30PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 5:30PM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:56PM
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Signed by the Governor