Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1502 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/05/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1502


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The life of an admired public servant drew to a close
 with the passing of Captain Jamie Graham of the McKinney Fire
 Department on May 4, 2023, at the age of 50; and
 WHEREAS, Affectionately known as "Bull," Jamie Graham was
 born on July 14, 1972; he joined the McKinney Fire Department on
 April 26, 1999, and over the course of his 24-year career with the
 agency, he rose through the ranks to become captain; he also served
 as a part-time fire instructor at the Collin College Fire Academy as
 well as a rescue specialist with Texas Task Force 2 of Urban Search
 and Rescue; moreover, he was a member of the technical rescue
 committee at the Texas Commission on Fire Protection; and
 WHEREAS, Captain Graham held a number of credentials from the
 Texas Commission on Fire Protection, including master firefighter,
 fire instructor, and hazardous materials technician
 certifications; he further distinguished himself by earning
 technical rescue certifications in such specialized areas as
 structural collapse, swift water, rope rescue, and confined space;
 and
 WHEREAS, In all his endeavors, Captain Graham enjoyed the
 love and support of his wife, Trish, and he took great pride in his
 sons, Jordan, Justin, Jet, and Randall; during his leisure hours,
 he liked snowboarding and traveling with his family; and
 WHEREAS, Admired for his leadership, integrity, and
 kindness, Jamie Graham devoted himself to protecting his fellow
 citizens and improving his community, and he leaves behind a record
 of service that his loved ones can remember with pride; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Captain Jamie
 Graham and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn his passing;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Captain
 Graham.
 Frazier
 Phelan Guerra Murr Phelan Guerra Murr
Phelan Guerra Murr
 Allen Guillen Neave Criado Allen Guillen Neave Criado
Allen Guillen Neave Criado
 Allison Harless Noble Allison Harless Noble
Allison Harless Noble
 Anchía Harris of Anderson Oliverson Anchía Harris of Anderson Oliverson
Anchía Harris of Anderson Oliverson
 Anderson Harris of Williamson Ordaz Anderson Harris of Williamson Ordaz
Anderson Harris of Williamson Ordaz
 Ashby Harrison Orr Ashby Harrison Orr
Ashby Harrison Orr
 Bailes Hayes Ortega Bailes Hayes Ortega
Bailes Hayes Ortega
 Bell of Kaufman Hefner Patterson Bell of Kaufman Hefner Patterson
Bell of Kaufman Hefner Patterson
 Bell of Montgomery Hernandez Paul Bell of Montgomery Hernandez Paul
Bell of Montgomery Hernandez Paul
 Bernal Herrero Perez Bernal Herrero Perez
Bernal Herrero Perez
 Bhojani Hinojosa Plesa Bhojani Hinojosa Plesa
Bhojani Hinojosa Plesa
 Bonnen Holland Price Bonnen Holland Price
Bonnen Holland Price
 Bowers Howard Ramos Bowers Howard Ramos
Bowers Howard Ramos
 Bryant Hull Raney Bryant Hull Raney
Bryant Hull Raney
 Buckley Hunter Raymond Buckley Hunter Raymond
Buckley Hunter Raymond
 Bucy Isaac Reynolds Bucy Isaac Reynolds
Bucy Isaac Reynolds
 Bumgarner Jetton Rogers Bumgarner Jetton Rogers
Bumgarner Jetton Rogers
 Burns Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr. Burns Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.
Burns Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.
 Burrows A. Johnson of Harris Rose Burrows A. Johnson of Harris Rose
Burrows A. Johnson of Harris Rose
 Button J. Johnson of Harris Rosenthal Button J. Johnson of Harris Rosenthal
Button J. Johnson of Harris Rosenthal
 Cain Jones of Dallas Schaefer Cain Jones of Dallas Schaefer
Cain Jones of Dallas Schaefer
 Campos Jones of Harris Schatzline Campos Jones of Harris Schatzline
Campos Jones of Harris Schatzline
 Canales Kacal Schofield Canales Kacal Schofield
Canales Kacal Schofield
 Capriglione King of Hemphill Shaheen Capriglione King of Hemphill Shaheen
Capriglione King of Hemphill Shaheen
 Clardy King of Uvalde Sherman, Sr. Clardy King of Uvalde Sherman, Sr.
Clardy King of Uvalde Sherman, Sr.
 Cole Kitzman Shine Cole Kitzman Shine
Cole Kitzman Shine
 Collier Klick Slaton Collier Klick Slaton
Collier Klick Slaton
 Cook Kuempel Slawson Cook Kuempel Slawson
Cook Kuempel Slawson
 Cortez Lalani Smith Cortez Lalani Smith
Cortez Lalani Smith
 Craddick Lambert Smithee Craddick Lambert Smithee
Craddick Lambert Smithee
 Cunningham Landgraf Spiller Cunningham Landgraf Spiller
Cunningham Landgraf Spiller
 Darby Leach Stucky Darby Leach Stucky
Darby Leach Stucky
 Davis Leo-Wilson Swanson Davis Leo-Wilson Swanson
Davis Leo-Wilson Swanson
 Dean Longoria Talarico Dean Longoria Talarico
Dean Longoria Talarico
 DeAyala Lopez of Bexar Tepper DeAyala Lopez of Bexar Tepper
DeAyala Lopez of Bexar Tepper
 Dorazio Lopez of Cameron Thierry Dorazio Lopez of Cameron Thierry
Dorazio Lopez of Cameron Thierry
 Dutton Lozano Thimesch Dutton Lozano Thimesch
Dutton Lozano Thimesch
 Flores Lujan Thompson of Brazoria Flores Lujan Thompson of Brazoria
Flores Lujan Thompson of Brazoria
 Frank Manuel Thompson of Harris Frank Manuel Thompson of Harris
Frank Manuel Thompson of Harris
 Frazier Martinez Tinderholt Frazier Martinez Tinderholt
Frazier Martinez Tinderholt
 Gamez Martinez Fischer Toth Gamez Martinez Fischer Toth
Gamez Martinez Fischer Toth
 Garcia Metcalf Troxclair Garcia Metcalf Troxclair
Garcia Metcalf Troxclair
 Gates Meyer Turner Gates Meyer Turner
Gates Meyer Turner
 Gerdes Meza VanDeaver Gerdes Meza VanDeaver
Gerdes Meza VanDeaver
 Geren Moody Vasut Geren Moody Vasut
Geren Moody Vasut
 Gervin-Hawkins Morales of Harris Vo Gervin-Hawkins Morales of Harris Vo
Gervin-Hawkins Morales of Harris Vo
 Goldman Morales of Maverick Walle Goldman Morales of Maverick Walle
Goldman Morales of Maverick Walle
 González of Dallas Morales Shaw Wilson González of Dallas Morales Shaw Wilson
González of Dallas Morales Shaw Wilson
 González of El Paso Morrison Wu González of El Paso Morrison Wu
González of El Paso Morrison Wu
 Goodwin Muñoz, Jr. Zwiener Goodwin Muñoz, Jr. Zwiener
Goodwin Muñoz, Jr. Zwiener
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1502 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on May 5, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Phelan Guerra Murr

Allen Guillen Neave Criado

Allison Harless Noble

Anchía Harris of Anderson Oliverson

Anderson Harris of Williamson Ordaz

Ashby Harrison Orr

Bailes Hayes Ortega

Bell of Kaufman Hefner Patterson

Bell of Montgomery Hernandez Paul

Bernal Herrero Perez

Bhojani Hinojosa Plesa

Bonnen Holland Price

Bowers Howard Ramos

Bryant Hull Raney

Buckley Hunter Raymond

Bucy Isaac Reynolds

Bumgarner Jetton Rogers

Burns Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.

Burrows A. Johnson of Harris Rose

Button J. Johnson of Harris Rosenthal

Cain Jones of Dallas Schaefer

Campos Jones of Harris Schatzline

Canales Kacal Schofield

Capriglione King of Hemphill Shaheen

Clardy King of Uvalde Sherman, Sr.

Cole Kitzman Shine

Collier Klick Slaton

Cook Kuempel Slawson

Cortez Lalani Smith

Craddick Lambert Smithee

Cunningham Landgraf Spiller

Darby Leach Stucky

Davis Leo-Wilson Swanson

Dean Longoria Talarico

DeAyala Lopez of Bexar Tepper

Dorazio Lopez of Cameron Thierry

Dutton Lozano Thimesch

Flores Lujan Thompson of Brazoria

Frank Manuel Thompson of Harris

Frazier Martinez Tinderholt

Gamez Martinez Fischer Toth

Garcia Metcalf Troxclair

Gates Meyer Turner

Gerdes Meza VanDeaver

Geren Moody Vasut

Gervin-Hawkins Morales of Harris Vo

Goldman Morales of Maverick Walle

González of Dallas Morales Shaw Wilson

González of El Paso Morrison Wu

Goodwin Muñoz, Jr. Zwiener