88R30924 CW-D By: Price H.R. No. 2057 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, The dedicated service and immeasurable sacrifice of our nation's military personnel are being recognized on May 18, 2024, as Americans observe this country's annual Armed Forces Day; and WHEREAS, Before 1950, separate days had been set aside to honor the branches of the armed forces individually; the establishment of a single observance followed the combining in 1947 of the Departments of War and Navy into one entity, the National Military Establishment, which two years later became known as the Department of Defense; and WHEREAS, Members of the U.S. Army, Navy, Marines, Air Force, Coast Guard, and Space Force are justly proud of the heroic deeds forged by those branches and by their ongoing contributions to maintain the security and liberty of American citizens both at home and abroad; and WHEREAS, The U.S. Army was established on June 14, 1775, when the Second Continental Congress authorized the formation of 10 companies of riflemen; from the American Revolution to operations in Afghanistan and Iraq, the army has furnished the majority of American ground troops when the country has taken up arms; today, this service is composed of a number of branches, including Infantry, Military Intelligence, Aviation, the Corps of Engineers, and Special Forces, and such specialized branches as the Army Medical Department Corps, Chaplain Corps, and Judge Advocate General's Corps; and WHEREAS, On October 13, 1775, the Second Continental Congress called for the fitting out of two warships, thereby founding the Continental Navy; although disbanded following the conclusion of the Revolutionary War, this service was reestablished with the creation of the Department of the Navy on April 30, 1798, and today, naval personnel ensure the defense of the nation by sea and by air and give seaborne support to the other military forces; and WHEREAS, A month after authorizing the procurement and dispatching of the navy's first ships, the Continental Congress passed a resolution, on November 10, 1775, calling for the raising of two marine battalions; the Marine Corps disbanded, like the navy, following the War of Independence, but it was reestablished on July 11, 1798; today, the Marine Corps conducts military operations on land, air, and sea, following faithfully in the footsteps of those who so valiantly fought and died in Belleau Wood and Afghanistan; and WHEREAS, The U.S. Air Force, which became a separate branch within the Department of Defense on September 18, 1947, had its genesis in the 1907 creation of an aeronautical division within the U.S. Army Signal Corps; military aviation subsequently achieved widespread recognition during World War I, when planes proved their effectiveness in reconnaissance and bombing missions, and air power became a crucial factor in World War II, during which time the U.S. Army Air Forces emerged as the most powerful air force in the world; today's air force defends the country in the realms of air, space, and cyberspace; and WHEREAS, Now part of the Department of Homeland Security, the U.S. Coast Guard has assumed many duties throughout its history, from protecting against pirates to intercepting contraband, conducting search and rescue operations, responding to oil spills, and licensing and certifying all U.S. maritime personnel; its wide-ranging wartime service has included escort and patrol duty and assisting amphibious landings; and WHEREAS, The U.S. Space Force was established on December 20, 2019, when the National Defense Authorization Act was signed into law, thereby creating the first new branch of the armed services in 73 years; composed of the three field components of the Space Operations Command, the Space Systems Command, and the Space Training and Readiness Command, the space force trains and equips its service members, called Guardians, to conduct global space operations in a number of areas; chief among them is the critical infrastructure that is increasingly dependent on satellites for communication, navigation, meteorology, and intelligence; and WHEREAS, Together with members of the reserve forces, the Army National Guard, and the Air National Guard, America's active-duty servicemen and servicewomen are committed to maintaining the nation's security and are prepared to do their utmost in defense of their country and the cause of freedom; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas Legislature hereby recognize May 18, 2024, as Armed Forces Day and extend to all members of the nation's military profound appreciation for their steadfast and courageous efforts in our country's behalf.