1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 2057 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, The dedicated service and immeasurable sacrifice of |
---|
6 | 6 | | our nation's military personnel are being recognized on May 18, |
---|
7 | 7 | | 2024, as Americans observe this country's annual Armed Forces Day; |
---|
8 | 8 | | and |
---|
9 | 9 | | WHEREAS, Before 1950, separate days had been set aside to |
---|
10 | 10 | | honor the branches of the armed forces individually; the |
---|
11 | 11 | | establishment of a single observance followed the combining in 1947 |
---|
12 | 12 | | of the Departments of War and Navy into one entity, the National |
---|
13 | 13 | | Military Establishment, which two years later became known as the |
---|
14 | 14 | | Department of Defense; and |
---|
15 | 15 | | WHEREAS, Members of the U.S. Army, Navy, Marines, Air Force, |
---|
16 | 16 | | Coast Guard, and Space Force are justly proud of the heroic deeds |
---|
17 | 17 | | forged by those branches and by their ongoing contributions to |
---|
18 | 18 | | maintain the security and liberty of American citizens both at home |
---|
19 | 19 | | and abroad; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | WHEREAS, The U.S. Army was established on June 14, 1775, when |
---|
21 | 21 | | the Second Continental Congress authorized the formation of 10 |
---|
22 | 22 | | companies of riflemen; from the American Revolution to operations |
---|
23 | 23 | | in Afghanistan and Iraq, the army has furnished the majority of |
---|
24 | 24 | | American ground troops when the country has taken up arms; today, |
---|
25 | 25 | | this service is composed of a number of branches, including |
---|
26 | 26 | | Infantry, Military Intelligence, Aviation, the Corps of Engineers, |
---|
27 | 27 | | and Special Forces, and such specialized branches as the Army |
---|
28 | 28 | | Medical Department Corps, Chaplain Corps, and Judge Advocate |
---|
29 | 29 | | General's Corps; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | WHEREAS, On October 13, 1775, the Second Continental Congress |
---|
31 | 31 | | called for the fitting out of two warships, thereby founding the |
---|
32 | 32 | | Continental Navy; although disbanded following the conclusion of |
---|
33 | 33 | | the Revolutionary War, this service was reestablished with the |
---|
34 | 34 | | creation of the Department of the Navy on April 30, 1798, and today, |
---|
35 | 35 | | naval personnel ensure the defense of the nation by sea and by air |
---|
36 | 36 | | and give seaborne support to the other military forces; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | WHEREAS, A month after authorizing the procurement and |
---|
38 | 38 | | dispatching of the navy's first ships, the Continental Congress |
---|
39 | 39 | | passed a resolution, on November 10, 1775, calling for the raising |
---|
40 | 40 | | of two marine battalions; the Marine Corps disbanded, like the |
---|
41 | 41 | | navy, following the War of Independence, but it was reestablished |
---|
42 | 42 | | on July 11, 1798; today, the Marine Corps conducts military |
---|
43 | 43 | | operations on land, air, and sea, following faithfully in the |
---|
44 | 44 | | footsteps of those who so valiantly fought and died in Belleau Wood |
---|
45 | 45 | | and Afghanistan; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | WHEREAS, The U.S. Air Force, which became a separate branch |
---|
47 | 47 | | within the Department of Defense on September 18, 1947, had its |
---|
48 | 48 | | genesis in the 1907 creation of an aeronautical division within the |
---|
49 | 49 | | U.S. Army Signal Corps; military aviation subsequently achieved |
---|
50 | 50 | | widespread recognition during World War I, when planes proved their |
---|
51 | 51 | | effectiveness in reconnaissance and bombing missions, and air power |
---|
52 | 52 | | became a crucial factor in World War II, during which time the U.S. |
---|
53 | 53 | | Army Air Forces emerged as the most powerful air force in the world; |
---|
54 | 54 | | today's air force defends the country in the realms of air, space, |
---|
55 | 55 | | and cyberspace; and |
---|
56 | 56 | | WHEREAS, Now part of the Department of Homeland Security, the |
---|
57 | 57 | | U.S. Coast Guard has assumed many duties throughout its history, |
---|
58 | 58 | | from protecting against pirates to intercepting contraband, |
---|
59 | 59 | | conducting search and rescue operations, responding to oil spills, |
---|
60 | 60 | | and licensing and certifying all U.S. maritime personnel; its |
---|
61 | 61 | | wide-ranging wartime service has included escort and patrol duty |
---|
62 | 62 | | and assisting amphibious landings; and |
---|
63 | 63 | | WHEREAS, The U.S. Space Force was established on December 20, |
---|
64 | 64 | | 2019, when the National Defense Authorization Act was signed into |
---|
65 | 65 | | law, thereby creating the first new branch of the armed services in |
---|
66 | 66 | | 73 years; composed of the three field components of the Space |
---|
67 | 67 | | Operations Command, the Space Systems Command, and the Space |
---|
68 | 68 | | Training and Readiness Command, the space force trains and equips |
---|
69 | 69 | | its service members, called Guardians, to conduct global space |
---|
70 | 70 | | operations in a number of areas; chief among them is the critical |
---|
71 | 71 | | infrastructure that is increasingly dependent on satellites for |
---|
72 | 72 | | communication, navigation, meteorology, and intelligence; and |
---|
73 | 73 | | WHEREAS, Together with members of the reserve forces, the |
---|
74 | 74 | | Army National Guard, and the Air National Guard, America's |
---|
75 | 75 | | active-duty servicemen and servicewomen are committed to |
---|
76 | 76 | | maintaining the nation's security and are prepared to do their |
---|
77 | 77 | | utmost in defense of their country and the cause of freedom; now, |
---|
78 | 78 | | therefore, be it |
---|
79 | 79 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas |
---|
80 | 80 | | Legislature hereby recognize May 18, 2024, as Armed Forces Day and |
---|
81 | 81 | | extend to all members of the nation's military profound |
---|
82 | 82 | | appreciation for their steadfast and courageous efforts in our |
---|
83 | 83 | | country's behalf. |
---|
84 | 84 | | Price |
---|
85 | 85 | | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | 86 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
87 | 87 | | I certify that H.R. No. 2057 was adopted by the House on May |
---|
88 | 88 | | 29, 2023, by a non-record vote. |
---|
89 | 89 | | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | 90 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|