Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2057 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 2057


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The dedicated service and immeasurable sacrifice of
 our nation's military personnel are being recognized on May 18,
 2024, as Americans observe this country's annual Armed Forces Day;
 and
 WHEREAS, Before 1950, separate days had been set aside to
 honor the branches of the armed forces individually; the
 establishment of a single observance followed the combining in 1947
 of the Departments of War and Navy into one entity, the National
 Military Establishment, which two years later became known as the
 Department of Defense; and
 WHEREAS, Members of the U.S. Army, Navy, Marines, Air Force,
 Coast Guard, and Space Force are justly proud of the heroic deeds
 forged by those branches and by their ongoing contributions to
 maintain the security and liberty of American citizens both at home
 and abroad; and
 WHEREAS, The U.S. Army was established on June 14, 1775, when
 the Second Continental Congress authorized the formation of 10
 companies of riflemen; from the American Revolution to operations
 in Afghanistan and Iraq, the army has furnished the majority of
 American ground troops when the country has taken up arms; today,
 this service is composed of a number of branches, including
 Infantry, Military Intelligence, Aviation, the Corps of Engineers,
 and Special Forces, and such specialized branches as the Army
 Medical Department Corps, Chaplain Corps, and Judge Advocate
 General's Corps; and
 WHEREAS, On October 13, 1775, the Second Continental Congress
 called for the fitting out of two warships, thereby founding the
 Continental Navy; although disbanded following the conclusion of
 the Revolutionary War, this service was reestablished with the
 creation of the Department of the Navy on April 30, 1798, and today,
 naval personnel ensure the defense of the nation by sea and by air
 and give seaborne support to the other military forces; and
 WHEREAS, A month after authorizing the procurement and
 dispatching of the navy's first ships, the Continental Congress
 passed a resolution, on November 10, 1775, calling for the raising
 of two marine battalions; the Marine Corps disbanded, like the
 navy, following the War of Independence, but it was reestablished
 on July 11, 1798; today, the Marine Corps conducts military
 operations on land, air, and sea, following faithfully in the
 footsteps of those who so valiantly fought and died in Belleau Wood
 and Afghanistan; and
 WHEREAS, The U.S. Air Force, which became a separate branch
 within the Department of Defense on September 18, 1947, had its
 genesis in the 1907 creation of an aeronautical division within the
 U.S. Army Signal Corps; military aviation subsequently achieved
 widespread recognition during World War I, when planes proved their
 effectiveness in reconnaissance and bombing missions, and air power
 became a crucial factor in World War II, during which time the U.S.
 Army Air Forces emerged as the most powerful air force in the world;
 today's air force defends the country in the realms of air, space,
 and cyberspace; and
 WHEREAS, Now part of the Department of Homeland Security, the
 U.S. Coast Guard has assumed many duties throughout its history,
 from protecting against pirates to intercepting contraband,
 conducting search and rescue operations, responding to oil spills,
 and licensing and certifying all U.S. maritime personnel; its
 wide-ranging wartime service has included escort and patrol duty
 and assisting amphibious landings; and
 WHEREAS, The U.S. Space Force was established on December 20,
 2019, when the National Defense Authorization Act was signed into
 law, thereby creating the first new branch of the armed services in
 73 years; composed of the three field components of the Space
 Operations Command, the Space Systems Command, and the Space
 Training and Readiness Command, the space force trains and equips
 its service members, called Guardians, to conduct global space
 operations in a number of areas; chief among them is the critical
 infrastructure that is increasingly dependent on satellites for
 communication, navigation, meteorology, and intelligence; and
 WHEREAS, Together with members of the reserve forces, the
 Army National Guard, and the Air National Guard, America's
 active-duty servicemen and servicewomen are committed to
 maintaining the nation's security and are prepared to do their
 utmost in defense of their country and the cause of freedom; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby recognize May 18, 2024, as Armed Forces Day and
 extend to all members of the nation's military profound
 appreciation for their steadfast and courageous efforts in our
 country's behalf.
 Price
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2057 was adopted by the House on May
 29, 2023, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House