Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2485 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 2485


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Santos Mijares Jr. of Eagle Pass, an esteemed
 community leader and a friend to many, passed away on September 4,
 2022, at the age of 63; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Santos and Florinda Mijares, Santos
 Mijares was born in Eagle Pass on February 8, 1959; at the age of 12,
 he became a migrant worker, joining his parents in farm fields to
 help provide for his family and his younger siblings; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Mijares sold insurance for a time before going
 on to open immigration services and tax preparation businesses; he
 also became a real estate investor; and
 WHEREAS, The trajectory of Mr. Mijares' life significantly
 changed in 1999 with the deepening of his faith; dedicated to giving
 back to his community, he started a weekly Bible study for local
 businessmen, provided financial counsel and support to local and
 out-of-town ministries, and used his construction expertise to help
 churches with their building projects; moreover, he took trips to
 Saltillo, Coahuila, Mexico, where he shared the Gospel and
 ministered to people; and
 WHEREAS, On September 3, 2017, Mr. Mijares was inspired to
 establish and pastor a local church that he named Nueva Creación
 Eagle Pass; the church would come to have a strong Christian
 influence in the city and serve as a welcoming place where families
 could gather and worship; realizing his dream to expand the church
 to accommodate a larger congregation, he used his construction
 knowledge to create plans for a church building with an accessible
 location; on September 3, 2021, Nueva Creación Eagle Pass hosted
 the inaugural raising of the Christian flag at Eagle Pass City Hall;
 in a span of five years, the church ministry hosted a series of
 local events that brought awareness to such issues as bullying and
 suicide while inspiring attendees to embark on their own personal
 journeys of faith; during his time as a Christian pastor,
 Mr. Mijares also served State Representative Heriberto "Eddie"
 Morales Jr., whom he helped draft his first prayer for the House
 floor; and
 WHEREAS, In all his endeavors, Mr. Mijares enjoyed the love
 and support of his wife of four decades, Sylvia, and his three
 children, Joshua, Krystal, and Nathan; and
 WHEREAS, Santos Mijares possessed a generosity of spirit that
 expressed itself in myriad ways, and he leaves behind a legacy of
 good works that will continue to inspire the residents of Eagle Pass
 and beyond for years to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Santos Mijares Jr. and
 extend heartfelt condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Sylvia Mijares; to his children, Joshua Mijares, Krystal Y.
 Mijares, and Nathan Mijares; to his parents, Santos and Florinda
 Mijares; to his nine siblings; and to all others who mourn his
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Santos
 Mijares.
 Morales of Maverick
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2485 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 29, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House