Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2496 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2023

                    H.R. No. 2496


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, U.S. Marine Corps Lance Corporal Erasmo Palos of
 Eagle Pass gave his life in service to our nation on March 31, 1968,
 at the age of 22; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Agustin and Elena Palos, Erasmo Palos was
 born on January 8, 1946, and he grew up with the companionship of
 seven siblings, Guadalupe, Martha, Bertha, Elidia, Manuel, Elva,
 and Daniel; he attended local schools, and during his youth, he
 played baseball and participated in 4-H clubs; he also enjoyed a
 rewarding career in the retail industry, and in his leisure time, he
 liked to play guitar and sing; and
 WHEREAS, Answering his nation's call to duty, Mr. Palos
 joined the U.S. Marine Corps in 1966, and he completed his basic
 training at Camp Pendleton in San Diego County, California; he went
 on to serve in the Philippines for a year, and he began a tour of
 duty in South Vietnam on February 26, 1968; assigned to the
 Headquarters and Service Company, 1st Battalion, 5th Marines, 1st
 Marine Division, III Marine Amphibious Force, he was killed in
 action at the Battle at Truoi River Bridge; he held the rank of
 lance corporal at the time of his death; and
 WHEREAS, Lance Corporal Palos received the National Defense
 Service Medal and the Rifle Sharpshooter Badge, and his posthumous
 military honors include the Purple Heart, the Republic of Vietnam
 Service Medal, the Vietnam Campaign Medal, the Republic of Vietnam
 Meritorious Unit Citation, the Marine Corps Good Conduct Medal, the
 Marine Corps Expeditionary Medal, the Combat Action Ribbon, and the
 Presidential Unit Citation Ribbon; he was also recognized in the
 Vietnam War 50th Year Commemoration by President Barack Obama; and
 WHEREAS, Serving with honor, courage, and dedication, Lance
 Corporal Erasmo Palos embodied the highest ideals of the United
 States armed forces, and for his immeasurable sacrifice, Americans
 owe him a profound debt that the passage of time can never diminish;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Lance Corporal
 Erasmo Palos and commend his family for faithfully preserving his
 legacy; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Erasmo
 Palos.
 Morales of Maverick
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2496 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 29, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House