Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2532 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2023

                    H.R. No. 2532


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The life of an admired public servant drew to a close
 with the passing of former Duval County constable Ramiro G. Perez of
 Concepcion, on May 14, 2022, at the age of 73; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Jesus and Alda Perez, Ramiro Perez was
 born in Starr County on April 9, 1949; he grew up with the
 companionship of 11 siblings, Maria, Jesus, Maximo, Reynaldo,
 Leocadia, Rene, Ruben, Roy, Alda, Linda, and Rhonda, and attended
 schools in Concepcion, Benavides, and Premont; he later enrolled at
 Del Mar College and earned associate's, bachelor's, and master's
 degrees in criminal justice; and
 WHEREAS, In 1976, Mr. Perez successfully ran for the office
 of Precinct 4 constable of Duval County as a write-in candidate; he
 served in that position until 1984 and continued in the role of
 sheriff's deputy from 1988 to 1996, when he was again elected
 constable; his career in law enforcement spanned a total of 40
 years, until his retirement from Duval County on January 6, 2021;
 along the way, he mentored many deputies and enjoyed a strong bond
 of camaraderie with his colleagues in the department, who always
 knew they could count on him to assist at a moment's notice; and
 WHEREAS, Constable Perez married the former Linda Esparza on
 June 15, 1979, and his beloved family also included his three
 children, Lynda, Ramiro, and Cynthia; and
 WHEREAS, Although the death of Ramiro Perez has brought great
 sorrow to all who knew him, he leaves behind a record of service
 that his loved ones can remember with pride; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of former Duval County
 constable Ramiro G. Perez and extend sincere sympathy to all those
 who mourn his passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Ramiro
 Perez.
 Guillen
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2532 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 29, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House