1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 2532 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, The life of an admired public servant drew to a close |
---|
6 | 6 | | with the passing of former Duval County constable Ramiro G. Perez of |
---|
7 | 7 | | Concepcion, on May 14, 2022, at the age of 73; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, The son of Jesus and Alda Perez, Ramiro Perez was |
---|
9 | 9 | | born in Starr County on April 9, 1949; he grew up with the |
---|
10 | 10 | | companionship of 11 siblings, Maria, Jesus, Maximo, Reynaldo, |
---|
11 | 11 | | Leocadia, Rene, Ruben, Roy, Alda, Linda, and Rhonda, and attended |
---|
12 | 12 | | schools in Concepcion, Benavides, and Premont; he later enrolled at |
---|
13 | 13 | | Del Mar College and earned associate's, bachelor's, and master's |
---|
14 | 14 | | degrees in criminal justice; and |
---|
15 | 15 | | WHEREAS, In 1976, Mr. Perez successfully ran for the office |
---|
16 | 16 | | of Precinct 4 constable of Duval County as a write-in candidate; he |
---|
17 | 17 | | served in that position until 1984 and continued in the role of |
---|
18 | 18 | | sheriff's deputy from 1988 to 1996, when he was again elected |
---|
19 | 19 | | constable; his career in law enforcement spanned a total of 40 |
---|
20 | 20 | | years, until his retirement from Duval County on January 6, 2021; |
---|
21 | 21 | | along the way, he mentored many deputies and enjoyed a strong bond |
---|
22 | 22 | | of camaraderie with his colleagues in the department, who always |
---|
23 | 23 | | knew they could count on him to assist at a moment's notice; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | WHEREAS, Constable Perez married the former Linda Esparza on |
---|
25 | 25 | | June 15, 1979, and his beloved family also included his three |
---|
26 | 26 | | children, Lynda, Ramiro, and Cynthia; and |
---|
27 | 27 | | WHEREAS, Although the death of Ramiro Perez has brought great |
---|
28 | 28 | | sorrow to all who knew him, he leaves behind a record of service |
---|
29 | 29 | | that his loved ones can remember with pride; now, therefore, be it |
---|
30 | 30 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas |
---|
31 | 31 | | Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of former Duval County |
---|
32 | 32 | | constable Ramiro G. Perez and extend sincere sympathy to all those |
---|
33 | 33 | | who mourn his passing; and, be it further |
---|
34 | 34 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
35 | 35 | | prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
36 | 36 | | Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Ramiro |
---|
37 | 37 | | Perez. |
---|
38 | 38 | | Guillen |
---|
39 | 39 | | ______________________________ |
---|
40 | 40 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
41 | 41 | | I certify that H.R. No. 2532 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
42 | 42 | | rising vote of the House on May 29, 2023. |
---|
43 | 43 | | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | 44 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|