House | 05/06/2023 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3244 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1172 | Journal Page: 3244 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3244 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3244 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 513 | |
House | 02/27/2023 | Filed |