Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Withdrawn from calendar
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:04PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:04PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:04PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:06PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:06PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:06PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:24PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:17PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:22PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:21PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:20PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:20PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:19PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:19PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:19PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:19PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:20PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:21PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:21PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:21PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:20PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:20PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:19PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:19PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:19PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:19PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:19PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:18PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:18PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:18PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:25PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:17PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:17PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:22PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:34PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:34PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:08PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:08PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:08PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:08PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:09PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:21PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:21PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:36PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:36PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:35PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:38PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:20PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:20PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:20PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:32PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:32PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:09PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:20PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:33PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:35PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:34PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:34PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Withdrawn from calendar
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:42AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:50AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:56AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:28AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:31AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:34AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:38AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:43AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:17AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:17AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:17AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:10AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:50AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:53AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:02AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:03AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:37AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:37AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:37AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:50AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:10AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:15AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:17AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:37AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:38AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:50AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:38AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:38AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:03AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:03AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:11AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:21AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:21AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:21AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:21AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:53AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:03AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 04/14/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Withdrawn from calendar
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 7:18PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:09PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:33PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:33PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 16 2023 8:20PM
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Withdrawn from calendar
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:38AM
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 12 2023 3:53PM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 8:43AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:17AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:11AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:50AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:39AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:20AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:37AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:38AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:50AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:03AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:22AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:51AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 10:03AM
Last Action: 03/17/2023 H Reported enrolled: Mar 17 2023 9:51AM