House | 03/30/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 926 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 926 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 772 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Filed |