Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR615 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

                    H.R. No. 615


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of John Richard Orr of Clint on February 27, 2023, at the
 age of 75; and
 WHEREAS, John Orr was born on October 7, 1947, to Gerry and
 James "Dick" Orr, and he grew up in the Lower Valley with two
 sisters, Gerry and Terry; after graduating from Fabens High School,
 he went on to attend Kemper Military School in Boonville, Missouri,
 and The University of Texas at El Paso; on February 3, 1969, he
 joined the United States Marine Corps, and from September 1969 to
 September 1970, he served as a scout sniper in Vietnam; he was
 honorably discharged at the rank of sergeant; and
 WHEREAS, Following his return from the military, Mr. Orr
 spent most of his life farming and working with cattle as a cattle
 truck driver and feed lot manager; during his leisure time, he
 enjoyed playing golf, attending the annual USMC Scout Sniper
 Association reunion and the yearly Cow Hauler reunions, and being
 with his family and friends; a proud veteran, he was selected to
 take the 2019 Honor Flight of Southern New Mexico and El Paso to
 Washington, D.C.; and
 WHEREAS, Above all else, Mr. Orr was devoted to his wife of 46
 years, Teresa, and his son, JJ; he was the proud grandfather of five
 grandchildren, Russell, who survives him, and Emma May, John
 William, James Benjamin, and Ava Nicole, who preceded him in death;
 and
 WHEREAS, Although John Orr is deeply missed, he has left his
 loved ones with a wealth of memories that they will forever
 treasure; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of John Richard Orr and
 extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Teresa Orr; to his son, John James "JJ" Orr, and his wife,
 Carolyn; to his grandson, Russell Welch; to his sisters, Gerry
 Reinhardt and her husband, Arthur, and Terry Anson and her husband,
 Robert; and to all others who mourn his passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of John Orr.
 González of El Paso
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 615 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 30, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House