Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR900 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/14/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 900


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Words cannot fully express the heartache felt by the
 family of Carin Elizabeth Kopecki of Panna Maria and her son, Raley
 Wayne Kopecki, who tragically lost their lives on June 6, 2022; and
 WHEREAS, The former Carin Elizabeth Stocks was born on
 June 27, 1989, to Steven and Tamlyn Stocks; she married Garrett
 Kopecki on October 23, 2010, and after working as a nurse at
 Guadalupe Regional Medical Center, she dedicated herself to
 supporting her husband in his business; she cherished the time she
 spent with her family and friends, and she enjoyed being out on the
 water with loved ones, whether surfing, visiting the bay or Frio
 River, or watching her husband wakeboard; fun-loving and
 adventurous, she was also fond of flying, skydiving, off-roading,
 and of course, shopping; she possessed a warm and caring nature and
 never hesitated to help others with anything they needed; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Kopecki's marriage was further enriched by the
 birth of the couple's son, Raley Wayne Kopecki, on July 7, 2016; an
 energetic and spirited young boy, Raley liked to make friends, play
 with his toys, tinker with tools, and roll around on his bicycle and
 Razor, and he adored his dog, Tate; he also shared his parents' love
 of venturing out to the lake and the beach, where he took joy in
 swimming, fishing, surfing with his mother, and riding on the boat
 and jet ski; and
 WHEREAS, Although they will be greatly missed, Carin and
 Raley Kopecki brightened the lives of everyone who was blessed to
 know them, and they will forever hold a treasured place in the
 hearts of their loved ones; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Carin Elizabeth and
 Raley Wayne Kopecki and extend deepest condolences to the members
 of their family: to Garrett Kopecki; to Tamlyn Stocks; to James
 Leasman; to Brett and Anna Leasman; to Katy Curry; to Eddie Stocks;
 to Jillian, Ryan, and Brax Leasman; to Kathy and Milton Kopecki; to
 Blaise and Kim Kopecki; to Ryan Kopecki; to Kurt and Heather
 Kopecki; to Ben and Genna Alexander; to Halleigh and Ty Kopecki; and
 to their other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Carin
 Elizabeth and Raley Wayne Kopecki.
 Guillen
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 900 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 14, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House