E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5616
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5060
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1998
|
Journal Page: 5059
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5059
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5059
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4939
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4939
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4609
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 795
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 795
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 795
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 795
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 795
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 795
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 795
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 King
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 310
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|