E
|
05/05/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/05/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
E
|
04/24/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1239
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1926
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1232
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1185
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#346
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
HB 2713
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2713
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1636
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 310
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|